YATE OUTDOOR SPORTS COMPLEX LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Sports and Community facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 April 2016: Standard registration
- YOSC LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY RICHARD JAMES DALE | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Chambers | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Thomas-Ellis | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Raymond Perry | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Paul Michael | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Beard | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN SUSAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL FORD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.67k | £78.34k | £111.36k | £92.04k | £110.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.10k | £84.36k | £79.50k | £99.60k | £97.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.47k | £36.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1 THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ATHLETICS, HOCKEY, FOOTBALL, AND ANY OTHER SPORTS, GAMES OR RELATED ACTIVITIES. 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION; 3 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF YATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; 4 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 5 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN YATE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES; 6 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF YATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. PROVIDED AT ALL TIMES THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yate Outdoor Sports Complex Ltd
Broad Lane
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 7LB
- Phone:
- 07989575026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window