Accounts and annual returns TINY TEDDIES COMMUNITY CRECHE

Charity number: 1166439
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On Time