ANN CONROY TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ann Conroy Trust is the only UK wide charity providing educational material about Chiari Malformation & Syringomyelia. The charity funds appropriate research, education of medical professionals and raises awareness. Produces information booklets distributed throughout the UK. Provides a support helpline and arranges meetings where patients, families and carers can meet others with the conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 March 2016: CIO registration
- 22 May 2017: Funds received from 510582 ANN CONROY TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM FLINT FRCS | Chair | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Selwyn Yates | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Haden | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Brereton | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Millward | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA DODWELL-PITT | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.45k | £153.42k | £21.25k | £34.40k | £42.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.37k | £10.44k | £9.95k | £21.88k | £25.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2025 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2025 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO SYRINGOMYELIA AND RELATED CONDITIONS AND TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING SUPPORT FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THESE CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ann Conroy Trust CIO
The Gateway
85 Sankey Street
Warrington
WA1 1SR
- Phone:
- 03001110004
- Email:
- info@annconroytrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window