MARKET HARBOROUGH STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Market Harborough Street Pastors is a group of Christians from different churches in the Harborough District. They patrol the streets on a Friday evening, or Saturday or Bank Holiday Sunday night caring for, listening to and helping people they meet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Total income includes £300 from 1 government contract(s) and £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 July 2016: CIO registration
- MHSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH HOWE | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Tebbutt | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Colin John | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Olive BRIGHTWELL | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Pedler | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MANDY GAYS | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER ARNOLD | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.12k | £8.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.28k | £8.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £300 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND BEYOND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AS FOLLOWS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STREET PASTOR LICENCE AGREEMENT WITH THE ?ASCENSION TRUST? THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PASTORAL CARE SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND OTHER PUBLIC PLACES, GIVING GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING WHICH ASSIST IN PRESERVING PUBLIC ORDER, AVOID ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AND BY (II) ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ECCLESIASTICAL RELEVANCE TO COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC LIFE, MOBILIZING THE CHURCH ECUMENICALLY TO UNITY OF WORSHIP AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY CARRYING OUT THE MISSION AND OUTREACH WORK OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN OUR COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE, THROUGH THE PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH FORMAL TRAINING, INFORMAL TALKS AND CAPACITY BUILDING IN VOLUNTARY SERVICES, ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND THE STREET PASTOR URBAN TRINITY PRINCIPLE OF CHURCH, POLICE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT WORKING TOGETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Gardiner Street
Market Harborough
LE16 9QW
- Phone:
- 07504 221696
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window