NORTH BENWELL YOUTH PROJECT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are delivered through group activities in specific venues, detached work in the area, holiday activities and one-to-one support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £115,057 from 13 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 18 February 2016: CIO registration
- 20 September 2016: Funds received from 1077220 NORTH BENWELL YOUTH PROJECT
- NBYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Spowart | Chair | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Eastabrook | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty McDine-Daniels | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KELLER | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|||||
JAMES GARRATT | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.61k | £150.91k | £156.69k | £70.02k | £123.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.01k | £106.98k | £124.92k | £146.81k | £147.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.34k | £280 | £24.93k | £115.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN NORTH BENWELL ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH BENWELL YOUTH PROJECT
80-84 ELLESMERE ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 8TS
- Phone:
- 01912983201
- Email:
- admin@nbyp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window