STANHOPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1166351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We have self-help groups in Pottery, Tiffany-style Glass, Sewing and Patchwork, Textiles including spinning and weaving, Ukulele, Bridge, Whist, Table Tennis, Exercise classes, Boccia, English, Maths and German Tutor, as well as Duke of Edinburgh's Award Scheme for Silver and Gold.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £44,187
Total expenditure: £41,572

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2016: CIO registration
  • 01 September 2016: Funds received from 514270 STANHOPE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERYL LYNDA BROWN Chair 03 March 2016
None on record
Hollie-Ann Coleman Trustee 28 May 2024
ALLEN VALLEYS COMMUNITY ARTS
Received: On time
Jennifer Johnson Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
MAUREEN SHEILA CLARK Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.75k £28.38k £38.56k £20.65k £44.19k
Total expenditure £22.20k £33.38k £37.31k £23.72k £41.57k
Income from government contracts £480 N/A N/A £650 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.90k £19.34k £2.67k £20.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stanhope Community Centre
11 Front Street
Stanhope
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 2NQ
Phone:
01388528955