TIBBS DEMENTIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tibbs Dementia Foundation provides services which promote the improved health of people affected by dementia and which provide relief, including care and support, to people with dementia and those who care for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £163,344 from 2 government contract(s) and £15,988 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 18 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Willis | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard James Gallivan | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margaret Herbert | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Murray Eales | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Tomlinson | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.07k | £203.36k | £247.31k | £364.67k | £426.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.44k | £157.68k | £225.98k | £293.36k | £389.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.39k | £62.49k | £165.04k | £163.34k | |
|
Income from government grants | £62.12k | N/A | £1.46k | £2.66k | £15.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
TIBBS DEMENTIA FOUNDATION PROVIDES SERVICES WHICH PROMOTE THE IMPROVED HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA AND WHICH PROVIDE RELIEF, INCLUDING CARE AND SUPPORT, TO PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Kimbolton Road
Bedford
MK40 2NR
- Phone:
- 01234210993
- Email:
- contact@tibbsdementia.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window