RIALTO NEIGHBOURHOOD COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities are community led ? Elders Luncheon Club & Bingo ? Meal delivery for housebound ? Sewing Classes ? Saturday fun & Allotment ? Trips ? Summer Half term Playscheme ? Lone Parent drop in session ? Office drop in ? link between housing and tenants ? Food Co-op ? Home visits for sick / housebound ? Community Bingo Night ? Thump Boxing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £16,939 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 14 April 1978: Standard registration
- 08 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- R N C (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.73k | £39.34k | £26.44k | £25.84k | £30.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.83k | £30.31k | £25.18k | £18.58k | £24.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 10 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 September 2017 | 224 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
17 February 2015 | 17 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1978 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA ENCLOSED BY PRINCES ROAD, UPPER PARLIAMENT STREET, WINDSOR STREET AND UPPER WARWICK STREET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window