THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSBURY: ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1166287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £186,553
Total expenditure: £199,240

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2016: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST ANDREW'S PCC, KINGSBURY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JASON RENDELL Chair 28 April 2019
None on record
Ronald Anthony Sembatya Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Lawrence Abosi Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Claudette Lorraine Graham Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Dinesh Johnson Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Toni Roberta Dawn Hossanah Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Sonia Lundy-Williams Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Betty Annette Toppin Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Mark Lloyd-Williams Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
GLORIA AYOINE WILLIAMS Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Jason Rendell Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
EILEEN MILLICENT YARDE Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
PATIENCE AFI BOATENG Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
WENDY VERONA RICHARDS Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
CHRISTINE OBY MADEKWE Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
ESTELLE MARGUERITA GOSSAGE Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
MARY VAVRA Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £180.00k £115.15k £165.51k £189.00k £186.55k
Total expenditure £141.00k £141.83k £140.87k £138.00k £199.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. ANDREWS VICARAGE
28 OLD CHURCH LANE
KINGSBURY
LONDON
NW9 8RZ
Phone:
02082057447