Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSBURY: ST ANDREW
Charity number: 1166287

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JASON RENDELL | Chair | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Anthony Sembatya | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Abosi | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudette Lorraine Graham | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Johnson | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toni Roberta Dawn Hossanah | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Lundy-Williams | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Betty Annette Toppin | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lloyd-Williams | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA AYOINE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Rendell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MILLICENT YARDE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATIENCE AFI BOATENG | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY VERONA RICHARDS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE OBY MADEKWE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE MARGUERITA GOSSAGE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY VAVRA | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.