THERAPY DOGS NATIONWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Therapy Dogs Nationwide is a non profit making organisation, managed entirely by volunteers.Therapy Dogs have been found to have all round benefits for people in hospitals, hospices, residential homes, schools, prisons, care centres etc. Volunteers are all registered with the organisation, their dogs are all temperament assessed and are covered by the obligatory insurance for visiting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 2016: CIO registration
- NATIONWIDE THERAPY PETS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EILEEN SLATTERY | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leisl De Lafontaine | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY OLIVER MBE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MRS EILEEN HODGE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.52k | £34.72k | £48.81k | £108.33k | £95.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.08k | £18.48k | £62.30k | £117.00k | £119.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, HEALTH OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPY DOGS TO VISIT SCHOOLS, NURSING HOMES, HOSPITALS, HOSPICES AND OTHER SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 Home Farm Road
Wirral
CH49 7LG
- Phone:
- 07840994003
- Email:
- admin@tdn.org.uk
- Website:
-
tdn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.