HEADING HOME MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heading Home Ministries, located in Chepstow, South Wales is a Christian based charity focused on providing a range of services to people whose lives have, or are, being destroyed because of their addiction to drugs and/or alcohol. We provide a rehabilitation referral service as well as supported housing services post rehabilitation. We also support a children's orphanage in Kenya Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 13 October 2016: CIO registration
- HEADING HOME (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Meredith | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Cheetham- Wilkinson | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM TERENCE MEREDITH | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/04/2020 | 16/04/2021 | 16/04/2022 | 16/04/2023 | 16/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.05k | £12.44k | £16.04k | £11.18k | £10.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.05k | £12.24k | £16.95k | £11.21k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 SEVERN BRIDGE PARK
BEACHLEY
CHEPSTOW
NP16 7HQ
- Phone:
- 07904955200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window