UMOJA STREET CHILD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Umoja Street Child Trust exists to support, fund and facilitate the work of the Umoja Boys Rescue Centre (UBRC) in Kwale, Kenya. The UBRC in turn exists to rescue, rehabilitate and restore street-living boys in Kenya. As part of these processes we also care for them at every stage, and enable the boys to either access education (by sending them to school) or we provide education on site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- Kenya
Governance
- 11 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LUKE IDEN WICKINGS | Chair | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Grier | Trustee | 09 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Mutio | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MISS GRACE WICKINGS BA DEVELOPMENT | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.53k | £57.10k | £64.12k | £61.95k | £68.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.04k | £59.50k | £64.77k | £59.79k | £72.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 394 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF STREET CHILDREN PARTICULARLY IN MOMBASA IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Church Street
FORDINGBRIDGE
Hampshire
SP6 1BB
- Phone:
- 07940720896
- Email:
- info@umojaboys.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window