GRIMSTHORPE AND DRUMMOND CASTLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and enhancement, for the public benefit, of Grimsthorpe Castle in Lincolnshire and Drummond Castle in Perthshire and their gardens and parkland together with the collections of art, furniture and the family and estate archives associated with the properties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,838,350
Donations and legacies | £2.66k | |
Charitable activities | £3.36m | |
Other trading activities | £106.99k | |
Investments | £347.87k | |
Other | £18.50k |
Total expenditure:
£3,539,415
Raising funds | £94 | |
Charitable activities | £3.54m | |
Other | £0 |
£76,164 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.54m | |
Retained for future use | £298.94k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.54m | |
Retained for future use | £375.10k |
People

53 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Troughton | Chair | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Roderick James Nugent Stewart | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLINE BUTLER | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
NICHOLAS JOHN SAMUEL HARRIES | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
SIR MARK JONES | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|||||||
SEBASTIAN MILLER | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
HUGH PATRICK MATHESON | Trustee | 14 December 2010 |
|
|||||||
BARONESS WILLOUGHBY DE ERESBY | Trustee | 14 December 2005 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD CALVOCORESSI CBE | Trustee | 14 December 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.94m | £2.56m | £3.04m | £8.23m | £3.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.41m | £2.82m | £4.07m | £3.93m | £3.54m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £145.01k | £7.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £145.01k | £9.77k | £1.37k | £2.66k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £196.87k | £106.99k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.70m | £2.40m | £3.01m | £3.04m | £3.36m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £239.41k | £14.08k | £17.86k | £208.45k | £347.87k | |
|
Income - Other | £750 | £0 | £0 | £4.79m | £18.50k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.26m | £2.68m | £3.94m | £3.92m | £3.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £155.81k | £146.69k | £128.07k | £7.07k | £94 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £48.53k | £37.82k | £31.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £155.81k | £146.69k | £128.07k | £0 | £94 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.69m | £23.20m | £28.27m | £35.19m | £39.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.02m | £15.32m | £631.41k | £625.79k | £701.95k | |
|
Other assets | £1.41m | £3.68m | £14.78m | £12.31m | £10.81m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £586.07k | £451.47k | £1.05m | £1.19m | £3.67m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 APRIL 1978, 14 DECEMBER 2005 AND 11 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND AID SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grimsthorpe & Drummond Castle Trust Ltd
Estate Office
Grimsthorpe
BOURNE
Lincolnshire
PE10 0LY
- Phone:
- 01778591205
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window