Accounts and annual returns WOS'AND SGTS' MESS, ROYAL ARTILLERY BARRACKS, LARKHILL

Charity number: 1165300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 July 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 11 July 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window