NEWHAVEN YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newhaven YFC currently run: a weekly open youth club for young people aged 11-18; a lunchtime club in a Secondary School in Newhaven; one camping trip and one residential each year; a monthly sports group; religious activities which inform young people about the Christian faith, such as a youth bible study and youth worship service and a group specifically for young people aged 10-14.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 September 2016: CIO registration
- NEWHAVEN YFC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David Milmine | Chair | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rita Jean Fannon | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Anne Musk | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Bracher | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher John ROBERTS | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.66k | £11.71k | £13.23k | £11.27k | £18.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.75k | £11.01k | £12.86k | £13.88k | £16.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150 | N/A | £4.20k | £760 | £200 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE AS FOLLOWS: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN APPENDIX 1 THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN NEWHAVEN AND ITS ENVIRONS; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROCLAIMING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN NEWHAVEN AND ITS ENVIRONS; (C) TO DEMONSTRATE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE CHRISTIAN VALUES, INCLUDING DIGNITY, EMPOWERMENT AND PARTNERSHIP TO ALL YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT NEWHAVEN AND ITS ENVIRONS; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUPPORT AND MENTORING IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, THROUGH LUNCHTIME AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS, STREET BASED YOUTH WORK AND OTHER YOUTH PROVISION TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS, AND THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; (E) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROMOTING OVERSEAS SERVICE, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ACTION AND WORKING WITH THOSE AFFECTED, EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH RELEVANT RELIEF AGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 Firle Road
SEAFORD
BN25 2JD
- Phone:
- 07763333998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window