PHOENIX SCOUTS, 191ST BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 507484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A balanced programme is run on a weekly basis which helps the children to gain badges. Outdoor activities are run which include tracking, camping and various other outdoor pursuits. The children also take part in District run activities, like swimming, five-a-side football, sports days etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,786
Total expenditure: £6,522

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PHOENIX SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
  • ST STEPHENS SCOUT GROUP REDNAL, 191ST BIRMINGHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Handel Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Anthony Gillam Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Russell Preece Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Gillian Monaghan Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
CHRISTOPHER GIBBS Trustee 08 March 2023
BROMSGROVE BEARS BASKETBALL CLUB
Recently registered
Colin Bennett Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Olwen Bird Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
JOHN MONAGHAN Trustee
None on record
David Porter Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.96k £3.07k £1.84k £4.40k £5.79k
Total expenditure £5.88k £4.35k £3.20k £3.91k £6.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
60 IRWIN AVENUE
REDNAL
BIRMINGHAM
B45 8QU
Phone:
01216089166
Website:

No information available