IPPLEPEN CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing the property interests of the village church charity. Surplus funds used to support the fabric of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 04 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Stuart Down | Chair | 28 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Clive Tompkins | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Jane Outhwaite | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.48k | £7.92k | £7.31k | £7.51k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.29k | £2.41k | £947 | £1.85k | £995 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 AUG 1880 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 30 JUN 1896 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 FEB 1912
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: 1. IN PAYMENT OF THE COST OF REPAIRS AND INSURANCE, AND ALL OTHER OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY, AND ALL PROPER COSTS, ADMINISTRATION CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AN INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THAT CHARITY. 2. AS TO THE RESIDUE, IN THE PAYMENT OF THE SAME TO THE CHURCHWARDENS OF THE PARISH OF IPPLEPEN FOR APPLICATION BY THEM IN OR TOWARDS SATISFYING CHARGES LAWFULLY INCURRED BY THEM IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF IPPLEPEN, AS NEED AND OCCASION SHALL REQUIRE, AND IN OR TOWARDS SATISFYING LIKE CHARGES IN RESPECT OF THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES OF THE SAID CHURCH AND OF THE FURNITURE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWALLOWFIELD
CONNIFORD LANE
IPPLEPEN
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 5UD
- Phone:
- 01803812066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window