TITHE BARN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide access to the Medieval Landbeach Tithe Barn and its surrounding green space. We offer free or low cost entry to our open days, events, talks and education visits. Access is open to all. Our aim is to provide a sustainable future for the Tithe Barn, so that it generates its own income for its ongoing maintenance and community use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 May 2016: CIO registration
- LANDBEACH TITHE BARN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Doak-Keszler | Chair | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Cross | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLIN GOHLER FLI | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|||||
MELANIE SARITA HALE | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN STRIPE | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.67k | £140.77k | £43.24k | £3.39k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.86k | £119.18k | £27.33k | £5.18k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAY 2016 AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND RESTORE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE HISTORIC TITHE BARN AT LANDBEACH IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE, AND TO PROVIDE THE PUBLIC WITH ACCESS TO THE BARN IN ORDER TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT ITS HISTORY AND HERITAGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 WATERBEACH ROAD
LANDBEACH
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 9FA
- Phone:
- 01223862297
- Email:
- tithebarntrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window