HOUR COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hour Community provides community transport, a dementia friendly lunch club, a drop in mental health cafe, and a befriending service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £26,632 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Richard Tanner | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Jack Edward Fairweather | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jayne Chesman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Salmon | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Mays | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Teresa Mary Eglinton | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ELIZABETH NORMAN | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.11k | £120.05k | £130.00k | £227.00k | £230.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.11k | £118.63k | £121.64k | £175.00k | £201.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £21.50k | £29.50k | £12.50k | £26.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL- HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY SERVICES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BEFRIENDING OR COMMUNITY TRANSPORT AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 College Road
Framlingham
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 9EJ
- Phone:
- 07860673700
- Email:
- nickcorke57@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window