THE FARAKUNKU FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Farakunku Foundation supports children and young people in The Gambia. Our activities focus on education and healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- The Gambia
Governance
- 12 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCINE HEGGIE | Chair | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wilson | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEX RANKIN | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH-FLEUR FITZ-RANKIN | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.31k | £8.66k | £11.95k | £11.95k | £19.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.39k | £9.58k | £10.93k | £11.41k | £15.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/02/2014
Charitable objects
A. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 IN THE GAMBIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL OR COLLEGE. B. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 IN THE GAMBIA. C. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING; GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. D. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE GAMBIA, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tattlebury
Borough Green Road
Ightham
SEVENOAKS
TN15 9HS
- Phone:
- 07795606140
- Email:
- alex@farakunku.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window