THE HULL HOMELESS COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and assist homeless persons and rough sleepers living in the Humber region and the City of Kingston upon Hull who are in need, in particular but not exclusively by helping assist in the provision of temporary and permanent accommodation, information, advice, employment, education and assistance. Also signposting on issues relating to healthcare, addiction and housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 May 2016: CIO registration
- #HHCP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW SMITH | Chair | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay May | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James May | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Celia Evans | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Russell | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Russell | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Banks | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2019 | 29/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.70k | £74.42k | £110.13k | £48.12k | £25.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.92k | £84.10k | £96.97k | £56.88k | £29.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £55.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 16 March 2024 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | 16 March 2024 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG HOMELESS PERSONS AND ROUGH SLEEPERS LIVING IN THE HUMBER REGION AND THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ON ACCOUNT OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HELPING ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE, EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE, ALSO SIGNPOSTING ON ISSUES RELATED TO HEALTHCARE, ADDICTION AND HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 West Hall Garth
South Cave
BROUGH
HU15 2HA
- Phone:
- 07960016762
- Email:
- info@hullhomeless.co.uk
- Website:
-
hullhomeless.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window