THE BLUE HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We curently provide self contained housing for the elderly within the Blue House, we raise funds for the upkeep of the listed building, to ensure the best environment for our residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 March 2016: CIO registration
- 14 January 2018: Funds received from 205916 THE BLUE HOUSE
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRIAM CHEAL | Chair | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Doctor Robert Griffiths | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAEVE ENGLAND | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN BARNES | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SANDON | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Isherwood | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CHRISTINE OAKES | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|||||
MR JIM DOWLING | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN OAKENSEN | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.75k | £122.30k | £118.73k | £125.94k | £165.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.34k | £87.79k | £115.32k | £136.45k | £179.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 MAR 2016 AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES. (2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE BENEFICIARIES OR A SUFFICIENT SECTION OF THEM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES DECIDE. 'BENEFICIARIES' (AND OTHER TERMS REFERRED TO IN THE DEFINITION) ARE DEFINED IN INTERPRETATIONS CLAUSE 30 AS BELOW: "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS AGED PEOPLE WHO WERE BORN IN OR WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (OR PEOPLE WITH A STRONG SOCIAL OR FAMILY CONNECTION TO, OR IN URGENT NEED OF LIVING IN, THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO HAVE A HOUSING NEED OR ARE IN OTHER HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS DEFINED IN THE ALLOCATIONS POLICY. "AREA OF BENEFIT" MEANS THE SOMERSET PARISHES OF BECKINGTON, BERKLEY, BUCKLAND DINHAM, FROME, GREAT ELM, LULLINGTON, NUNNEY, SELWOOD, TRUDOXHILL AND WHATLEY AND, IF THERE ARE NO APPLICANTS FORTHCOMING FROM THESE PLACES, THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF FROME AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINANCE AND ADMINISTRATION OFFICER
THE BLUE HOUSE
THE BRIDGE
FROME
SOMERSET
BA11 1AP
- Phone:
- 01373462577
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window