ASHOVER PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Buildings, & space for;- the benefit of the inhabitants of Ashover & Surrounding area, Sports facilities, Youth drop-in centre, Plays, Pantomimes, & rehearsal rooms, Weddings, Parties, Mother and toddler groups, Meetings, Concerts, Educational & the advancement of education, the advancement of social and community welfare, Reduced rates for other charities and educational groups, etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 28 January 2016: CIO registration
- 27 April 2016: Funds received from 520406 ASHOVER PARISH HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Archibold | Chair | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hirst | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN MARIE WALLHEAD | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Carline | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Marie Biggs | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joy Stephenson | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Dronfield | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Wray | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bassett | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Bassett | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANGELA EARLY | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.51k | £52.02k | £63.46k | £63.47k | £91.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.28k | £41.42k | £49.82k | £69.23k | £80.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.86k | N/A | £500 | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ASHOVER, DERBYSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHOVER PARISH HALL
MILKEN LANE
FAR HILL
ASHOVER
CHESTERFIELD
S45 0BA
- Phone:
- 01246590005
- Email:
- info@ashoverparishhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window