S. PETER AND S. PAUL RC SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
setting up foundraising activities (Easter raffle; mother's day gift etc) to raise money for - Junior playrground refurbishment - Lunch Time Chess Club - Debate Me membership
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 November 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Islington
Governance
- 25 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jane Young | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh-rose Falco | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Mildred Arlain Ball | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Zurawska | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTHE DANZIN | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
cristiona McGuinness | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/11/2017 | 11/11/2018 | 11/11/2019 | 11/11/2020 | 11/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £6.70k | £6.65k | £703 | £1.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.34k | £3.63k | £3.83k | £115 | £7.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days | |
Annual return | 11 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days | |
Annual return | 11 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 November 2020 | 16 October 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 November 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters & St. Pauls School
Compton Street
LONDON
EC1V 0EU
- Phone:
- 07786383135
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window