THE LONDON BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the craft of beekeeping in an urban environment through education of our members and interested members of the general public. Promote the needs of pollinating insects other than honey bees, through media appearances, public outreach and collaborations with local councils, other organisations and academics. Develop and deliver pollinator forage-planting projects throughout London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 February 2016: CIO registration
- LBKA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Bassey | Chair | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Whyatt | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||
William Bunker | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE PATRICIA MCGEOCH | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Hodges | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Saville | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
RICHARD GLASSBOROW | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRISTRAM JAMES SUTTON MA | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD NICHOLS BSC FCA | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Hankins | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.67k | £10.48k | £30.36k | £32.62k | £25.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.50k | £9.62k | £16.74k | £23.39k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING, INCLUDING EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 High Street
South Norwood
London
SE25 6EF
- Phone:
- 07973561669
- Email:
- admin@lbka.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window