NEWWAY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NEWway Project was set up in 2013 in order to support the rising numbers of homeless people in the London Borough of Newham. Our team works alongside specialist support agencies, local churches and hundreds of local volunteers to provide three core services: NEWdawn - a winter night shelter, NEWday - year round daytime support services, and NEWlife - gardening workshops for local rough sleepers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £73,407 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 09 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW PORTER | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Agnieszka Pogorzelec | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Wood | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVE CHESNEY | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.73k | £386.70k | £550.56k | £254.89k | £439.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.41k | £329.43k | £467.97k | £285.10k | £389.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.32k | N/A | £151.22k | £15.00k | £73.41k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £312.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £237.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £467.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF INDIVIDUALS IN NEED IN NEWHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF 2. TEMPORARY SHELTER AND FOOD. 3. ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO SEEK SUBSEQUENT ACCOMMODATION. 4. INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SIGNPOSTING TOWARDS MEETING RELATED NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NEWHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bonny Downs Baptist Church
Darwell Close
LONDON
E6 6BT
- Phone:
- 07490983777
- Email:
- admin@newwayproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window