HALO CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote & protect physical & mental health of children & young adults living in Greater London, who have experienced the loss of a familty member or someone close to them by providing & assisting in the provision of services related to bereavement care such as therapeutic play & counselling. To advance the education of the general public in all areas relating to bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 03 May 2016: CIO registration
- HALO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATIMA RAHIL | Chair | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adela Grimshaw | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
khadijah larkins | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle McCarroll | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.19k | £133.50k | £87.09k | £201.89k | £66.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.84k | £81.57k | £66.46k | £93.21k | £93.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.70k | £31.74k | £52.57k | £7.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 May 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN GREATER LONDON, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS, WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED THE LOSS OF A FAMILY MEMBER OR SOMEONE CLOSE TO THEM BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES RELATED TO BEREAVEMENT CARE SUCH AS THERAPEUTIC PLAY AND COUNSELLING. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO BEREAVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mailbox 24
Hayes Business Studios
4-5 Damson Drive
Hayes
UB3 3DY
- Phone:
- 07903 709622
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window