Financial history MEN'S SHED STRATFORD UPON AVON

Charity number: 1167338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/01/2020 26/01/2021 26/01/2022 26/01/2023 26/01/2024
Total gross income £2.48k £400 £925 £1.20k £10.49k
Total expenditure £3.46k £474 £2.50k £1.19k £4.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A