MUSCLIFF-WHITTAKER FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity ceased at 31 August 2022
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
Governance
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.78k | £310 | £950 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.38k | £2.86k | £655 | £70 | £845 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £280 | £350 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MUSCLIFF AND SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, RACE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS, OR OTHER BELIEFS OR OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND RESIDENTS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE AND RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE MUSCLIFF YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE, HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE SHACK, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; (3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window