BISHOP'S WALTHAM GARDENING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and manage designated allotment plots for individuals plus raised beds adapted for wheelchair users. Organise and deliver lectures, discussions and demonstrations. Visit places and organisations of horticultural interest. Liaise with local councils and other community organisations to promote horticulturally related activities. Hold horticultural shows and competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 September 2016: CIO registration
- 01 November 2017: Funds received from 1118069 BISHOPS WALTHAM GARDENING CLUB
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bennett | Chair | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Martha Lucas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Perry | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BREACH | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Ronald Haysom | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Haysom | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maewyn Cumming | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Cassell | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hamill | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA MABEY | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LARRY MABEY | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.81k | £8.91k | £7.65k | £13.10k | £15.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £5.38k | £5.64k | £12.88k | £14.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCE EDUCATION AND GOOD PRACTICE IN HORTICULTURE; TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2. PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC; IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHOSE HEALTH IS AT RISK AND WHO HAVE BEEN ADVISED TO EXERCISE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ALLOTMENTS FOR GARDENING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NESTLEDOWN
ALBANY ROAD
BISHOPS WALTHAM
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1BY
- Phone:
- 07775563865
- Email:
- Bwgc-info@bwgc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window