Financial history CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (CONQUERORS IN CHRIST PARISH)

Charity number: 1171838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £9.78k £10.97k £12.33k £15.37k £15.35k
Total expenditure £8.52k £8.87k £10.85k £15.32k £12.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A