CLYBIAU FFERMWYR IFANC CEREDIGION / CEREDIGION FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A unique volunteer led organisation for young people between 10 and 26 years old who live in the rural area of Ceredigion. The movement provides fantastic opportunities and experiences for young people of all ages and background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £11,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

23 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 04 April 2016: CIO registration
- 06 November 2018: Funds received from 523877 THE CARDIGANSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION YOUNG FARMERS'...
- CFFI CEREDIGION / CEREDIGION YFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bleddyn Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dyfan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beca Reed | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Betsan Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cerys Owens | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dyfan Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Jenkins | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Delor James | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bleddyn McAnulty-Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elliw Dafydd | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gethin Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELEN JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CARYS JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Meirian Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elin Calan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Pugh-Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.93k | £62.25k | £80.90k | £149.41k | £159.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.63k | £69.59k | £82.21k | £146.25k | £156.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.00k | £22.25k | £12.68k | £11.00k | £11.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, RURAL LIFE AND AFFAIRS, INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING, HOME CRAFTS, THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS, TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, RAISE AWARENESS, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS INTO FULL CITIZENS. TO PROMOTE ITS ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE MEDIUMS OF WELSH AND ENGLISH AND TO ENSURE THOSE ACTIVITIES ENHANCE THE MEMBERS' UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF WELSH RURAL LIFE, WELSH CULTURE AND THE WELSH LANGUAGE, ALONG WITH PROVIDING AN UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER CULTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANOLFAN ADDYSG FELIN FACH
DYFFRYN AERON
LLANBEDR PONT STEFFAN
CEREDIGION
SA48 8AF
- Phone:
- 01570471444
- Email:
- ceredigion@yfc-wales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window