Trustees NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE BACH CHOIR SOCIETY
Charity number: 507520

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Arkless | Chair | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Helen Foster | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Bosomworth | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Mary Anderson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Blenkarn-Durning | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Tarpy | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Clancy | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.