THE GRAND PRIORY OF BLESSED ADRIAN FORTESCUE OF THE ORDER OF MALTA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE SUPPORTED BY THE ORDER IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 20 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Alexander Jennings | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
FRA' IAN CHARLES DAMIEN SCOTT | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lt Col. Hugo Thomas de Burgh | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard John Berkley-Matthews | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Fra' Max Rumney | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.06k | £46.90k | £40.11k | £193.89k | £71.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.01k | £36.04k | £45.88k | £75.91k | £78.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 February 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUL 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE SUPPORTED BY THE ORDER IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. IN CARRYING OUT ITS OBJECTS THE CHARITY SHOULD NOT BE INVOLVED IN OR SUPPORT ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IS CONTRARY TO THE TEACHINGS OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Golden Square
London
W1F 9JP
- Phone:
- 07590851417
- Email:
- rumney@mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window