Financial history BELMONT GROSVENOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.58k £3.17k £10.42k £11.50k £15.53k
Total expenditure £21.26k £8.30k £2.17k £1.09k £12.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A