GROVE GREEN COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grove Green Community Hall based in Grove Green Maidstone is available for hire by local people, particularly in Grove Green, Weavering and Bearsted Park. There are regular events held including a pre-school nursery 5 mornings a week, indoor bowls, Scottish Dancing, Karate, Brownies and Rainbows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 23 March 2016: CIO registration
- 05 September 2019: Funds received from 298026 GROVE GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIC DAVIES | Chair | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Cameron | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mildenhall | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul McLean | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Finch | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.60k | £30.85k | £18.29k | £22.21k | £23.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.15k | £15.14k | £16.75k | £26.36k | £27.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GROVE GREEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside
Weavering Street
Weavering
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5JS
- Phone:
- 01622730740
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window