BILTON VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide open space for sport. We have highly active amature Rugby League & Football clubs with teams 6yrs to open age. The fields are open for general recreation, (Phase 1 of a Play park expected in 2014). The Village hall provides venue for WI, local wives group, Karate and several differnt dance meetings as well as a locally renouned dance school. rooms are for hire for parties and meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 May 1978: Standard registration
- BILTON MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS & VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- BILTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- BILTON MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WALTON | Chair | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Emma Monterio | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denise Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Guest | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terri Leigh Herzberg | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Kitching | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||
James Noble | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.07k | £21.64k | £17.24k | £12.75k | £25.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.42k | £16.46k | £16.41k | £18.96k | £36.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) PLAYING FIELDS FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BILTON IN EAST YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Beech Avenue
Bilton
Hull
HU11 4EN
- Phone:
- 07889707595
- Email:
- bilton.events@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
biltonvillagehall.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window