SRINIVAS/ USHA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year the organisation endeavoured to provide funds for such charitable causes that would further the objects of the purposes for which the charity was set up. Grants were made directly to support various causes that assist childrens health and education and community centres that help the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 24 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anand Ram Dharan | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doraiswamy Ram | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr DORAISWAMY SRINIVAS | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
USHA KUMAR | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.10k | £62.50k | £39.53k | £122.55k | £47.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.04k | £62.50k | £39.48k | £76.58k | £82.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 APR 2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Ashley Gardens
Ambrosden Avenue
LONDON
SW1P 1QG
- Phone:
- 02078280163
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window