TOUCAN FOR CHILDREN CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Toucan for Children provides a play therapy service for children and young people between the ages of 4 and 13 years who live in Gloucestershire and surrounding areas. Our team of therapists offer children a safe place to explore and work-through feelings and behaviours that are causing upset and difficulties in their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 September 2016: CIO registration
- TFC (Working name)
- TOUCAN FOR CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Halling | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Beard | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Claire Murphy | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Swordy | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY BEARD | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARIE WATKINS | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN COOMBS | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WATKINS BPhil | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.23k | £88.11k | £109.34k | £158.96k | £197.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.36k | £68.39k | £100.70k | £115.80k | £169.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £57.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.80k | £5.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO CHILDREN, AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO CHILDREN'S HEALTH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO BEHAVIOURAL, DEVELOPMENTAL AND EMOTIONAL ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 6/6E
THE MEWS
MITCHELDEAN
GL17 0SL
- Phone:
- 07526245880
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window