BOOK BUZZ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities have not commenced.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nigeria
Governance
- 06 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOLA SHONEYIN | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BEN AARONOVITCH | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOJISOLA ADENIRAN | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 06 September 2022 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 06 September 2022 | 582 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NIGERIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BOOKS WITH A VIEW TO:- A) PROMOTING READING AND LITERACY TO IMPROVE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES; B) ASSISTING WITH THE SETTING UP OF SCHOOL LIBRARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Healey Avenue
High Wycombe
HP13 7JR
- Phone:
- 07939358225
- Email:
- director@akefestival.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window