EKISA UK

Charity Number: 1167405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, the relief and assistance of those in Uganda in need by reason of ill-health, disability or poverty, in particular but not exclusively by supporting the charitable work of Ekisa Ministries International.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £43,388
Total expenditure: £43,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER NICHOLAS LEMON Chair 01 June 2016
None on record
Linda Henderson Trustee 12 February 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MILTON IN THE DIOCESE OF ELY
Received: On time
Emily Henderson Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Michelle Louise Peters Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
Dr Roxane Owen Trustee 01 June 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MILTON IN THE DIOCESE OF ELY
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHE JOHN ARHEL Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.78k £13.87k £26.83k £27.77k £43.39k
Total expenditure £18.02k £16.27k £29.28k £27.80k £43.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 BUTT LANE
MILTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 6DG
Phone:
07734 506085