FAITH IN GOVERNMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Faith in Government helps Christians in public and private sectors in low and middle income countries to promote the sound administration and development of the law, according to the tenets of their faith. It does this by fundraising in the UK, then giving small grants to a Christian NGO in the Philippines, and to support publications and global conferences on this subject.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Philippines
Governance
- 10 June 2016: CIO registration
- FIG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARTIN ALLABY BM,BCh,PhD | Chair | 13 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FRICKER | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CROZIER | Trustee | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.98k | £24.85k | £33.34k | £22.11k | £23.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.19k | £7.48k | £8.00k | £31.94k | £9.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. ENABLING AND AIDING CHRISTIANS IN PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTORS IN LOW AND MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LAW, ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THEIR FAITH. 2. THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW IN THE PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTORS IN LOW AND MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Poplar Road
Botley
OXFORD
OX2 9LB
- Phone:
- 07904760105
- Email:
- martin.allaby@gmail.com
- Website:
-
faithingovernment.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window