Financial history THE MELBOURNE SPORTING PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1169306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £112.52k £121.17k £149.10k £196.87k £174.94k
Total expenditure £101.92k £97.41k £108.35k £133.33k £166.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £86.91k £14.67k N/A N/A