Trustees THE MELBOURNE SPORTING PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1169306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gregory Smith Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Nigel James Theobald Trustee 23 January 2023
None on record
Christopher Archer Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Gerard Cantwell Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
Roger Spencer Trustee 27 April 2018
None on record
Sallie Allen Trustee 27 April 2018
None on record
MELBOURNE RFC LIMITED Trustee 20 September 2016
None on record