AVA HUNT THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ava Hunt Theatre (CIO): creating stimulating, high quality theatre and workshops for community audiences and young people. The company works with a range of Associate artists. Since 2010 Ava Hunt Theatre has been creating theatre that challenges the theatrical form, raise questions and provokes debate. We want to contribute to a society where compassion, cohesion and collaboration are valued.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £810 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Rushton | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sukhdeep Sidhu | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Harris | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hall | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Watts OBE | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.55k | £37.06k | £5.88k | £5.31k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.42k | £22.86k | £17.40k | £5.49k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.81k | £33.16k | N/A | N/A | £810 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY THROUGHOUT THE EAST MIDLANDS AND NATIONALLY BY PRODUCING EDUCATION WORKSHOPS AND THEATRE PERFORMANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of Derby Theatre Ltd
Derby Theatre
15 Theatre Walk
Eagle Centre
DERBY
DE1 2NF
- Phone:
- 07989621959
- Email:
- info@avahunt.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window