Accounts and annual returns ALIVIA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1169631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 October 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 September 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 November 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 23 November 2020 84 days late