Anglican Missionary Congregations(AMC)Headquarters(A.K.A AMC-Church of Restoration Manchester UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 15 February 2017: CIO registration
- N/A (Working name)
- CHURCH OF RESTORATION (NIGERIAN ANGLICAN CONGREGATION) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Herbert Okwelogu | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|||||
REV CANON CHUKWUAGOZIE UDEDIBIA | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Somtobenna Okeke | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patrick Chike Anochie Dr | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christiana Akobi | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chidi Niteh | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mbanefo Ilonzo | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRACE URUM | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev EMEKA AKOBI | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr BLESSING OTUBELU | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.33k | £112.03k | £296.75k | £211.25k | £275.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.19k | £76.41k | £204.54k | £278.04k | £361.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Feb 2017 as amended on 13 Jun 2019 as amended on 26 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN MANCHESTER CITY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMC Church Of Restoration
70 Chalford Road
MANCHESTER
M23 2SG
- Phone:
- 07482801848
- Email:
- AMCUKIE1@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window