DERBYSHIRE PARENT CARER VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a registered chairty which is run by parent/carer volunteers with children/young people with Special Educational Needs and/or Disabilities. We organise parent participation, providing the opportunity to talk about all the services they receive in Derbyshire. Derbyshire Parent Carer Voice has been set up to help parents have a forum for change within Derbyshire services. Parent Forum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,870 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 August 2016: CIO registration
- DPCV (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Claire Louise Walsh | Chair | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fox | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Queralto | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lamb | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hague | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Morley | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Gaunt | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Thornber | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Aucote | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Pauk | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.70k | £21.81k | £21.74k | £17.50k | £35.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.18k | £14.96k | £18.92k | £17.40k | £21.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.99k | £19.90k | £17.50k | £17.50k | £24.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE DISABILITIES OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES IN THE DERBYSHIRE AREA, IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING PROMOTING THEIR VOICE AND EMPOWERING THEM WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PROMOTING THEIR INCLUSION AND HELPING AND SUPPORT THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thorn Place
Main Road
Eyam
HOPE VALLEY
Derbyshire
S32 5QW
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window