FRIENDS OF BURY MUSIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT ORGANISATION FOR THE STAFF, PUPILS, AND ACTIVITIES OF BURY MUSIC CENTRE. RAISING FUNDS TO PURCHASE NEW INSTRUMENTS, AND TO PROVIDE LOANS TO PARENTS TO ASSIST THEM TO PURCHASE INSTRUMENTS. ASSIST WITH ORGANISING CONCERTS FOR VARIOUS BANDS AND ORCHESTRAS COACHED BY THE BURY MUSIC CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bury
Governance
- 16 May 1978: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BURY SCHOOLS' MUSIC CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Sedgwick | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Gledhill | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Green | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.80k | £8.78k | £1.67k | £6.85k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.64k | £10.06k | £4.40k | £9.19k | £13.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF BURY SCHOOLS' MUSIC CENTRE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE CENTRE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Bury Music Service Ltd
99 The Rock
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 0NB
- Phone:
- 01617969910
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window